+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- Report READ and REJECTED and the Bill INDEFINITELY POSTPONED in concurrence
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED.
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative HARNETT from the Committee on JUDICIARY Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
On May 25, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - REF TO HHS
On May 18, 2021 in the joint:
- Referred To - HHS
- Voted - REFERRED
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 2, 2021 in the joint:
- Public Hearing Held - TABLED
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on February 8, 2021.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor