+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- FINALLY PASSED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-39), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-39) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-39).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Mazurek of Knox, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor