+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subsequently FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
- On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-246) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-246) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Subsequently On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Taken from the table by the President
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-246).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-246) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Resolve was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor