+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Veto overridden (Emer)
- LD 4 In Senate, June 16, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 28 In Favor and 7 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
- Taken from the table by the President ProTem
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- 135 having voted in the affirmative and 6 in the negative, with 10 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 63V
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-41), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED , in concurrence. READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-41) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- READ the Second Time.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-41).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-41) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- On OBJECTION of Representative FREDETTE of Newport REMOVED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Edgecomb of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, in concurrence.
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
- Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 202 - 7 section 2231
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2015: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 7
May 12, 2015: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 135
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor