+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-613), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-613) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-613).
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
- Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- Chapter null - 38 section 361-A, sub-section 3-D
- Chapter null - 38 section 414-D
- Chapter null - 38 section 414-B, sub-section 1
- Chapter 353 - 38 section 361-A, sub-section 3-D
- Chapter 353 - 38 section 414-D
- Chapter 353 - 38 section 414-B, sub-section 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor