+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 267 Yeas 23 - Nays 12 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- Subsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Taken from the table by the President
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report,
- Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Reports READ
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 204
- (Yeas 67 - Nays 64 - Absent 17 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Representative WARREN of Hallowell moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Reports READ.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
- Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 25 section 2012, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 17-A section 1059
+ − Votes (2)
June 11, 2019: ACCEPT MAJ ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 12
June 6, 2019: Acc Maj Ought Not to Pass Rep
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 64
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 17