+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 28
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
- 34 Yeas - 0 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- Chapter 26 - 25 section
- Chapter 26 - 25 section 2221
- Chapter 26 - 25 section 2222
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: ENACTMENT
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor