+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 145 having voted in the affirmative and 0 in the negative, with 6 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 84V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll Call # 72 34 Yeas - 0 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED
- LD 373 In Senate, May 19, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-42).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-42).
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (S-42) READ and ADOPTED Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Davis of Piscataquis REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 95 - 12 section 11154, sub-section 15
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2015: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 145
- Absent: 6
May 19, 2015: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1