+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- FINALLY PASSED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-37).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-37).
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-37) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS