+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- PREVAILED
- (35 -Yeas, 0 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- Roll Call Number 27
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered)
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 142 - Nays 1 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 18
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-8).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-8).
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-8) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- Chapter 34 - 10 section 962, paragraph 1
- Chapter 34 - 10 section 969-A, sub-section 3
- Chapter 34 - 10 section 1013, sub-section 13
- Chapter 34 - 20-A section 11458
- Chapter 34 - 20-A section 11460
- Chapter 34 - 20-A section 11461
- Chapter 34 - 20-A section 11463
+ − Votes (2)
April 3, 2013: ENACT-EMER 2/3 ELECT
- Yeas: 35
April 2, 2013: Enactment - Emer
- Yeas: 142
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor