+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-34), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-34) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-34).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Mazurek of Knox, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- Chapter 51 - 29-A section 1255, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter 51 - 29-A section 1255, sub-section 1, paragraph B
- Chapter 51 - 29-A section 1255, sub-section 2
- Chapter 51 - 29-A section 1406, sub-section 5
- Chapter 51 - 29-A section 1406, sub-section 6
- Chapter 51 - 29-A section 1406, sub-section 7
- Chapter 51 - 29-A section 1406, sub-section 8
- Chapter 51 - 29-A section 1410, sub-section 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor