+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (46)
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- On motion by Senator THIBODEAU of Waldo The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought to Pass Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED In NON-CONCURRENCE
On July 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On July 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- Unfinished Business
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester to RECEDED and CONCUR FAILED. ROLL CALL NO. 389
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 71 - Nays 74 - Absent 6 - Excused 0)
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION.
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 348 Yeas 18 - Nays 17 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Taken from the table by the President
- READ ONCE
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED In NON-CONCURRENCE
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass Report, In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Senator KEIM of Oxford moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass Report.
- Reports READ
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- ROLL CALL NO. 284
- Reports READ.
- Representative MOONEN of Portland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport to TABLE pending the motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 68 - Nays 75 - Absent 7 - Excused 1)
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 285
- (Yeas 72 - Nays 71 - Absent 7 - Excused 1)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 23, 2017: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 74
- Absent: 6
June 20, 2017: ACCEPT MIN OTP RPT
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 17
June 9, 2017: TABLE UNTIL LATER
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 75
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
June 9, 2017: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 71
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7