+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-6), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-6) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-6).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Mazurek of Knox, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor