+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator JOHNSON of Lincoln the Minority Ought Not To Pass Report Accepted , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Taken from the table by the President
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
- Reports READ
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- READ the Second Time.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative FOWLE of Vassalboro, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock, REFERRED to the Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, in concurrence.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
- Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.