+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Reports READ.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-28) was READ and ADOPTED.
- On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-28).
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE
- Reports READ
- On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-28) Report ACCEPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-28)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-28) READ and ADOPTED
- Sent down for concurrence
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 17, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On February 23, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 4, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 89 - 29-A section 454, sub-section 2
+ − Sponsor
Ned CLAXTON
Type:
Primary Sponsor