+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 48 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 116 - Nays 26 - Absent 8 - Excused 1)
- ROLL CALL NO. 16
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT, in concurrence.
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
- Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 3 - 30-A section 7051, sub-section 11
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2017: ENACT-EMER 2/3 ELECT
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 21, 2017: Enactment - Emer
- Yeas: 116
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor