+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- HELD at the Request of Senator MASON of Androscoggin.
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence.
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required. , in concurrence.
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-303) thereto
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) , in concurrence.
- On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) , in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-303) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) READ and ADOPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-303) thereto ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-303) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending in concurrence.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 179
- (Yeas 125 - Nays 17 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) .
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) READ and ADOPTED.
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-191).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 311 - 32 section 15102, sub-section 1, paragraph E
+ − Vote
June 8, 2015: Enactment
- Yeas: 125
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor