+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-450), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-450) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-450).
On June 8, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On June 4, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On May 18, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On February 24, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on January 28, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor