+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- Subsequently, the House INSISTED on its previous action whereby it INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Unanimous REFER TO THE COMMITTEE ON CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Report of the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator COLLINS of York The Senate INSISTED To REJECTION of the Report and Bill and accompanying papers be COMMITTED to the Committee on Transportation and ASKED for a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE.
- Taken from the table by the President
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator COLLINS of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Unanimous REFER TO THE COMMITTEE ON CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Report and REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report READ and REJECTED
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator COLLINS of York Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Transportation , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative McLEAN from the Committee on TRANSPORTATION Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Collins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation, in concurrence.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.