+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-15).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-15) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-15).
On March 9, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On February 25, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 11, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter 23 - 15 section 3402, sub-section 2-A
- Chapter 23 - 15 section 3402, sub-section 1, paragraph H
- Chapter 23 - 15 section 3402, sub-section 1, paragraph D
- Chapter 23 - 15 section 3402, sub-section 1, paragraph B
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor