+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Senate ADHERED to Accept the Minority Ought to Pass Report AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED In NON-CONCURRENCE
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 43 Yeas 18 - Nays 17 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the The Minority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Taken from the table by the President
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reports READ
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass Report, In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass Report.
- Unfinished Business
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 77 - Nays 68 - Absent 6 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 14
- On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- in concurrence
- REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
- Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2017: ACCEPT MIN OTP RPT
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 17
March 7, 2017: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 68
- Absent: 6