+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Same Senator COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York.
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "B" (H-506) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence.
- On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-506) Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (H-506), in concurrence..
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Later today assigned.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, on motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- (Yeas 88 - Nays 49 - Absent 14 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 341
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "B" (H-506) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-506).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 17, 2013: ACC MIN OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 49
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor