+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (42)
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature (Emergency Measure)
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Amendment "A" (S-56) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) was READ.
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-56) thereto was ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-56) thereto.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Representative TUCKER of Brunswick moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE
- Taken from the table by the President
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-56) thereto ADOPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) READ
- On motion by Senator FOLEY of York Senate Amendment "A" (S-56) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-56) thereto
- Sent down for concurrence
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
- Senator CARSON of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 38 section 3106, sub-section 7
- Chapter 133 - 38 section 3106, sub-section 7