+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-221) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-312) thereto.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-221) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-312) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-221) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-312) thereto ADOPTED
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-312) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-221) READ and ADOPTED
- Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby The Senate ADOPTED Committee Amendment "A" (H-221)
- On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
- On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-221) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-221) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
- Reports Read
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative PIERCE of Falmouth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-221) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-221).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION in concurrence
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION.
- Joint Select Committee on Marijuana Legalization Implementation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- Chapter 278 - 7 section 1-C
- Chapter 278 - 7 section 2442, sub-section 7
- Chapter 278 - 7 section 2442, sub-section 9
- Chapter 278 - 7 section 2444
- Chapter 278 - 7 section 2445, paragraph 1
- Chapter 278 - 7 section 2446, sub-section 2
- Chapter 278 - 7 section 2448, sub-section 4
- Chapter 278 - 7 section 2448, sub-section 6
- Chapter 278 - 7 section 2448, sub-section 8
- Chapter 278 - 7 section 2455