+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Haskell of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION
- Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 25 - 36 section 191, sub-section 2, paragraph L
- Chapter 25 - 36 section 191, sub-section 2, paragraph Q
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor