+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-76), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-76) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-76).
On January 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Dill of Penobscot REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On January 2, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative HICKMAN for the Maine Milk Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor