+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED.
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York, Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED .
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on June 19, 2013 pursuant to Joint Rule 309.
- From the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE.
- Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor