+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (63)
On July 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Veto overridden (Emer)
On July 9, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Engrossing Department.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 144 having voted in the affirmative and 0 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 734V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On July 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- LD 238 In Senate, July 9, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 31 IN FAVOR and 3 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
- Taken from the table by the President
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-443).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- RELEASED.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subsequently Report ACCEPTED
- Taken from the table by the President
- HELD at the Request of Senator CUSHING of Penobscot.
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-443) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-443)
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report
- Report READ
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
- Taken from the table by the President
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker laid before the House
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Bill was TABLED pending REFERENCE in concurrence.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION
- Taken from the table by the President
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
- Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (64)
- Chapter null - 22 section 2425, sub-section 12, paragraph H
- Chapter null - 22 section 2428, sub-section 1-A, paragraph F
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-I
- Chapter null - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 1, paragraph J
- Chapter null - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 2, paragraph N
- Chapter null - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 1, paragraph H
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-G
- Chapter null - 22 section 2425, sub-section 12, paragraph I
- Chapter null - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 2, paragraph G
- Chapter null - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 1, paragraph K
- Chapter null - 22 section 2423-F
- Chapter null - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 2, paragraph M
- Chapter null - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 11, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 12
- Chapter null - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 1, paragraph I
- Chapter null - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 13
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-H
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-E
- Chapter null - 22 section 2425, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-D
- Chapter null - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 14
- Chapter null - 22 section 2428, sub-section 1-A, paragraph E
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 5-C, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 22 section 2428, sub-section 10
- Chapter null - 22 section 2428, sub-section 1-A, paragraph D
- Chapter null - 22 section 2425, sub-section 12, paragraph J
- Chapter null - 22 section 2425, sub-section 4-A
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-F
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 14-A
- Chapter null - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 10
- Chapter null - 22 section 2428, sub-section 1-A, paragraph G
- Chapter null - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 2, paragraph L
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2425, sub-section 12, paragraph H
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2428, sub-section 1-A, paragraph F
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-I
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 1, paragraph J
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 2, paragraph N
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 1, paragraph H
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-G
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2425, sub-section 12, paragraph I
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 2, paragraph G
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 1, paragraph K
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2423-F
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 2, paragraph M
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 11, paragraph B
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 12
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 1, paragraph I
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 13
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-H
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-E
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2425, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-D
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 14
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2428, sub-section 1-A, paragraph E
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 5-C, paragraph A
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2428, sub-section 10
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2428, sub-section 1-A, paragraph D
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2425, sub-section 12, paragraph J
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2425, sub-section 4-A
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-F
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 14-A
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 10
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2428, sub-section 1-A, paragraph G
- Chapter 447 - 22 section 2423-A, sub-section 2, paragraph L
+ − Votes (2)
July 9, 2018: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 7
July 9, 2018: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor