+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On September 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Carried over to the next special session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION
- Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed