+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-7), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-7) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence.
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-7).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Collins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation, in concurrence.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor