+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-871), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-871) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-871).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 29, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On March 2, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Reconsidered
On January 19, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
On June 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Approved
On May 21, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Requested
On May 7, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 17, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on January 25, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter 561 - 26 section 626, paragraph 7
- Chapter 561 - 26 section 626, paragraph 6
- Chapter 561 - 26 section 626, paragraph 1
- Chapter 561 - 26 section 626, paragraph 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor