+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- in concurrence
- REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
- Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 12 - 8 section 601
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor