+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
- LD 21 In Senate, May 4, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 128 having voted in the affirmative and 17 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 62V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-22), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-22) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-22).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- in concurrence
- REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on JUDICIARY
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 42 - 18-A section 5-104, sub-section 0-c, paragraph 4
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 35
May 2, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 128
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5