+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
- Reports READ.
- On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. (Remarks Made)
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 105 - Nays 40 - Absent 6 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 66
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Representative PRIEST of Brunswick moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Reports READ.
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Later today assigned.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Valentino of York, REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Vote
May 1, 2013: Acc Maj Ought Not to Pass Rep
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 40
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor