+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-974), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-974) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-974).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 11, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On March 30, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On March 25, 2022 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Hickman of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative CAIAZZO for the Joint Standing Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs pursuant to Resolve 2021, chapter 21, section 2, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- Chapter 634 - 5 section 4653, sub-section 1, paragraph B
- Chapter 634 - 37-B section 463
- Chapter 634 - 37-B section 3, sub-section 1, paragraph D
- Chapter 634 - 19-A section 4013, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter 634 - 17-A section 506-A, sub-section 3
- Chapter 634 - 17-A section 506-A, sub-section 1, paragraph A
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor