+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
- READ ONCE
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor