+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-688), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-688) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-688).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
- Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- Chapter 602 - 32 section 2600-G
- Chapter 602 - 32 section 3300-J
- Chapter 602 - 24 section 2905-B
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor