+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-850), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-850) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-850).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 28, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On March 21, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Reconsidered
On February 1, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Carney of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative HARNETT for the Criminal Law Advisory Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 17-A, section 1354, subsection 2, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 701 - 15 section 3308-C, sub-section 10, paragraph E
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor