+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On July 9, 2018 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- In non concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 76 having voted in the affirmative and 67 in the negative, with 8 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
- ROLL CALL NO. 729V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On July 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- LD 1884 In Senate, July 9, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 31 IN FAVOR and 3 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- Motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 676
- (Yeas 53 - Nays 86 - Absent 12 - Excused 0)
- On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 677
- (Yeas 78 - Nays 60 - Absent 13 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-489).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Amendment "B" (S-489) was READ and ADOPTED.
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-489)
- Reports READ
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (S-489)
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "B" (S-489) READ and ADOPTED
- Sent down for concurrence
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (21)
- Chapter null - 15 section
- Chapter null - 19-A section 4002, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 15 section 411
- Chapter null - 15 section 424
- Chapter null - 15 section 423
- Chapter null - 15 section 431
- Chapter null - 15 section 422
- Chapter null - 15 section 421
- Chapter null - 15 section 415
- Chapter null - 15 section 412
- Chapter null - 15 section 414
- Chapter null - 15 section 401
- Chapter null - 15 section 417
- Chapter null - 15 section 416
- Chapter null - 15 section 413
- Chapter null - 15 section 393, sub-section 1, paragraph E
- Chapter null - 34-B section 3873-A, sub-section 5, paragraph A-1
- Chapter null - 15 section 393, sub-section 1-C
- Chapter null - 4 section 1801
- Chapter null - 34-B section 3873-A, sub-section 7-A
- Chapter null - 34-B section 3873-A, sub-section 7-B
+ − Votes (4)
July 9, 2018: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 67
- Absent: 8
July 9, 2018: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
June 20, 2018: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 86
- Absent: 12
June 20, 2018: ACC MIN OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 60
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor