+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature (Emergency Measure)
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-972) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-972) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-972).
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-972) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 11, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On March 3, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On February 1, 2022 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.