+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On March 8, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP
On March 4, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - ONTP
- Work Session Held
On February 24, 2022 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor