+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-446) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-446).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-446).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 17, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On February 14, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 700 - 32 section 97
+ − Sponsors (4)
Glenn CURRY
Type:
Primary Sponsor