+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-671), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reports Read
- On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-671) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-671).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-671) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On December 23, 2019 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on December 19, 2019.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 562 - 20-A section 3272, sub-section 3, paragraph A
- Chapter 562 - 20-A section 5001-A, sub-section 4, paragraph A