+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
- LD 1851 In Senate, May 1, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 In the Affirmative and 15 In the Nagative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
- Roll Call # 633
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BOYLE of Cumberland The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-799) , in concurrence.
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator BOYLE of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass pursuant to Joint Order 2013, S.P. 742 Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
- Representative WELSH of Rockport moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass pursuant to Joint Order 2013, S.P. 742 Report.
- Motion of Representative CHAPMAN of Brooksville to TABLE until later in today's session FAILED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 623
- (Yeas 16 - Nays 126 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- ROLL CALL NO. 624
- (Yeas 87 - Nays 56 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative WELSH of Rockport, House Amendment "A" (H-799) was ADOPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-799).
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- READ ONCE.
- On motion by Senator BOYLE of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass Pursuant to Joint Order Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 1, 2014: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 15
April 3, 2014: TABLE UNTIL LATER
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 126
- Absent: 9
April 3, 2014: ACC MAJ OUGHT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor