+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-192) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-192) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 162 Yeas 11 - Nays 24 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- Motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ACCEPT The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED
- Reports READ
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- (Yeas 98 - Nays 46 - Absent 5 - Excused 2)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 131
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-192).
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-192) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 184 - 22-A section 203, sub-section 5
+ − Votes (2)
May 24, 2017: ACCEPT MIN ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 24
May 23, 2017: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 46
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5