+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-466) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-466).
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-466).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (20)
- Chapter null - 20-A section 8403-A, sub-section 6
- Chapter null - 20-A section 8403-A, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 20-A section 15688-A, sub-section 8
- Chapter null - 20-A section 8403-A, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 20-A section 5809
- Chapter null - 20-A section 8403-A, sub-section 5
- Chapter null - 20-A section 15681-A, sub-section 4-A
- Chapter null - 20-A section 15688-A, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 20-A section 15681-A, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 20-A section 8451-B
- Chapter 420 - 20-A section 8403-A, sub-section 6
- Chapter 420 - 20-A section 8403-A, sub-section 2
- Chapter 420 - 20-A section 15688-A, sub-section 8
- Chapter 420 - 20-A section 8403-A, sub-section 3
- Chapter 420 - 20-A section 5809
- Chapter 420 - 20-A section 8403-A, sub-section 5
- Chapter 420 - 20-A section 15681-A, sub-section 4-A
- Chapter 420 - 20-A section 15688-A, sub-section 1
- Chapter 420 - 20-A section 15681-A, sub-section 4
- Chapter 420 - 20-A section 8451-B
+ − Sponsors (9)
LANGLEY
Type:
Primary Sponsor