+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-175) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-175) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-175).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- Chapter 87 - 22 section 7250, sub-section 4, paragraph I
- Chapter 87 - 22 section 7250, sub-section 4, paragraph J
- Chapter 87 - 22 section 7250, sub-section 4, paragraph K