+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature (Emergency Measure)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-378).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-378).
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-378) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- Chapter null - 17 section 1837-A, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 17 section 1837-A, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 17 section 1837-A, sub-section 3
- Chapter 365 - 17 section 1837-A, sub-section 4
- Chapter 365 - 17 section 1837-A, sub-section 2
- Chapter 365 - 17 section 1837-A, sub-section 3