+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On September 13, 2018 in the House:
- The Bill was in the possession of the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Carried over to the next special session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subsequently On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
- Taken from the table by the President
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- Chapter null - 36 section 5122, sub-section 2, paragraph OO
- Chapter null - 20-A section
- Chapter null - 36 section 5217-D, sub-section 2-A
- Chapter null - 36 section 5122, sub-section 2, paragraph NN
- Chapter null - 36 section 5122, sub-section 2, paragraph PP
- Chapter null - 20-A section 12945
- Chapter null - 20-A section 12943
- Chapter null - 20-A section 12941
- Chapter null - 20-A section 12942
- Chapter null - 20-A section 12944
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor