+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-20), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-20) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-20).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 37 - 22 section 2847
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor